EP0625522 - Benzopyran derivatives and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi, 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sohda, Takashi 27-20, Higashikanmaki 2-chome Takatsuki, Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
Taketomi, Shigehisa 11-11, Hachizuka 3-chome Ikeda, Osaka 563 / JP | 03 /
Oda, Tsuneo 132-4, Saiinhisada-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615 / JP | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107334.8 | 11.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | JP19930115950 | 18.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11595093 | JP19940033911 | 03.03.1994 Original published format: JP 3391194 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625522 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625522 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/655, A61K31/66, C07F9/6574, C07F9/6558, C07F9/6571 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
C07F9/65586 (EP,US);
C07F9/65522 (EP,US);
C07F9/657181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Benzopyran-Derivate und ihre Verwendung | [1994/47] | English: | Benzopyran derivatives and their use | [1994/47] | French: | Dérivés de benzopyrane et leur utilisation | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 24.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.1998 | BE | 19.08.1998 | ES | 19.08.1998 | GR | 19.08.1998 | IT | 19.08.1998 | NL | 19.08.1998 | DK | 19.11.1998 | PT | 19.11.1998 | SE | 19.11.1998 | IE | 11.05.1999 | LU | 11.05.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
ES | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
DK | 19.11.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
LU | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
ES | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
DK | 19.11.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
ES | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
NL | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
ES | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
GR | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
SE | 19.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 19.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 19.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9203451 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [A] 1,16 * page 9, line 18 - line 34 * * page 21 - page 23 *; | [A]WO9206083 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [A] 1,16 * page 25 * * claims 1-13 *; | [DA]EP0524023 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [DA] 1,16* the whole document * |