EP0628939 - Method and arrangement for unambiguously allocating measurement results in road traffic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beier, Wolfgang Alte Renninger Strasse 123 D-71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 02 /
Diez, Helmut Birkenstrasse 54 D-71296 Heimsheim / DE | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107445.2 | 13.05.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | DE19934317822 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4317822 | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628939 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628939 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G08G1/04 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
G08G1/017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur eindeutigen Zuordnung von Messergebnissen im Strassenverkehr | [1994/50] | English: | Method and arrangement for unambiguously allocating measurement results in road traffic | [1994/50] | French: | Méthode et arrangement pour attribuer sans ambiguité des resultats de mesure dans le trafic routier | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 06.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 20.07.2000 | [2002/10] |
Former [2001/12] | IE | 20.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1204484 (GEN ELECTRIC & ENGLISH ELECTRI [GB]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,7; | [YA]WO9215978 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [Y] 4,6,7 * the whole document *[A] 1,2 |