EP0624810 - Optical fiber connector unit and optical fiber connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-19 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-19 / JP | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 1-6 Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshizawa, Takashi 7-13-17, Musashidai Hidaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Oguchi, Shigemitsu 1526-27, Yamaguchi, Tokorozawa Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nagayama, Akira 3-1-3-202, Hyakunin-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kanayama, Kazunori 4-10-3, Nakanobe, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kato, Kuniharu No.101, 747-77, Funaishikawa, Tokai-mura Naka-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 06 /
Ando, Yasuhiro 2-14-14, Izumi-cho Houya-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94107485.8 | 13.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | JP19930112552 | 14.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11255293 | JP19930118333 | 20.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11833393 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624810 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624810 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624810 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
G02B6/3869 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/3818 (EP,US);
G02B6/3893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | Baugruppe für Glasfaserverbindung und Glasfaserstecker | [1994/46] | English: | Optical fiber connector unit and optical fiber connector | [1994/46] | French: | Unité de connexion à fibre optique et connecteur à fibre optique | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61204608 ; | [A]US4240695 (EVANS ROBERT F [US]) [A] 10* column 2, line 38 - line 58; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB2112170 (MOLEX INC) [A] 10 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - line 14 * * page 2, line 40 - line 54 *; | [XA]EP0216643 (ITT [US]) [X] 10 * page 4, line 37 - page 6, line 11 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 19; figure 3 * [A] 11,12,16; | [A]EP0223608 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [Y]WO8807691 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US4804243 (BORSUK LESLIE M [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract *; | [A]US4944568 (DANBACH PHILIP J [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 2,3,6 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870203), vol. 011, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 542), & JP61204608 A 19860910 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 03) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * |