EP0626593 - Ultrasonic detection apparatus in particular for an automatically controlled windshield cleaning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | Ultrasonic detectionapparatus in particular for an automatically controlled windshield cleaning system | ||
[1997/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 2501 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiget, Fridolin Avenue des Alpes 22 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 94107681.2 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | EP19930108345 | 24.05.1993 Original published format: EP 93108345 | FR19930012682 | 25.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9312682 | [1994/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626593 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626593 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, G01D3/028, B60S1/08 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B60S1/0855 (EP);
B60S1/0818 (EP);
G01D3/028 (EP);
G01V1/001 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/48] | G01V1/00, G01D3/04, B60S1/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/48] | Title | German: | Ultraschalldetektionsgerät insbesondere für eine automatisch gesteuerte Windschutzreinigungsanlage | [1994/48] | English: | Ultrasonic detection apparatus in particular for an automatically controlled windshield cleaning system | [1997/41] | French: | Dispositif de détection ultra-sonore, notamment pour un système de nettoyage de pare-brise à commande automatique | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/48] | Ultrasonic detectionapparatus in particular for an automatically controlled windshield cleaning system | Examination procedure | 09.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0512653 (DYNAMAD) [Y] 1,9,10 * abstract * * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 37 * [A] 3; | [YA]SU1742730 ; | [A]DE4300371 (KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1 * column 6, line 21 - line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4033975 (AISIN SEIKI K.K.) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,2 * * column 3, line 41 - line 59 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 42 * * column 8, line 17 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0321146 (SIMMONDS PRECISION PRODUCTS) [A] 1 | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-181187, & SU1742730 A 00000000 (TAGANROG RADIO ENG INST) [Y] 1,9,10 * abstract * [A] 4,5 |