EP0625576 - A gene coding for autonomous replication of a plasmid in Coryneform bacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohama, Keiko, c/o Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd. Tsukuba Research Center, 3-1, Ami-machi, Chuo 8-chome, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Hatakeyama, Kazuhisa, Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd. Tsukuba Research Center, 3-1, Ami-machi, Chuo 8-chome, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Kurusu, Yasurou, c/o Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd. Tsukuba Research Center, 3-1, Ami-machi, Chuo 8-chome, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Yukawa, Hideaki, c/o Mitsubishi Petro. Co. Ltd. Tsukuba Research Center, 3-1, Ami-machi, Chuo 8-chome, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki / JP | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Kolb, Helga, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent-und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107850.3 | 20.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | JP19930118397 | 20.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11839793 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0625576 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0625576 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/77, C12N1/21, C12P21/00, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:15),(C12N1/21, C12R1:13) | [1994/47] | CPC: |
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12N15/69 (EP,US);
C12N15/77 (EP,US);
Y10S435/84 (EP);
Y10S435/843 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/47] | Title | German: | Gen, welches autonome Replikation eines Plasmids in Coryneform-Bakterien Kodiert | [1994/47] | English: | A gene coding for autonomous replication of a plasmid in Coryneform bacteria | [1994/47] | French: | Un gène codant pour la réplication autonome d'un plasmide dans les bactéries Coryneformes | [1994/47] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 10.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/38] | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0352763 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 *claims*; | [D]US5185262 (KOHAMA KEIKO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0472869 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1 *examples 1-3 and 8; claims* |