EP0633019 - Pressurized gas packagings using polyoxyethylene glyceryl fatty acid esters as suspension stabilizers and valve lubricants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 01277 Dresden / DE | [1999/32] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 D-01277 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettche, Helmut, Dr. Martinstrasse 23 D-63128 Dietzenbach / DE | 02 /
Muckenschnabel, Reinhard, Dr. Am Weissen Turm 33 D-60388 Frankfurt / DE | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Decker, Karl-Ludwig Arzneimittelwerk Dresden GmbH Fachbereich Patente Postfach 10 01 57 01435 Radebeul / DE | [1999/32] | Application number, filing date | 94107874.3 | 21.05.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | DE19934322703 | 08.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4322703 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633019 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633019 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/02] | Title | German: | Druckgaspackungen unter Verwendung von Polyoxyethylen-glyceryl-fettsäure-estern als Suspensionsstabilisatoren und Ventilschmiermittel | [1995/02] | English: | Pressurized gas packagings using polyoxyethylene glyceryl fatty acid esters as suspension stabilizers and valve lubricants | [1995/02] | French: | Conditionnement de gaz comprimé avec polyoxyéthylène glyceryl esters d'acide gras comme stabilisateurs de suspensions et lubricants pour valves | [1995/02] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0206291 (KLINGE CO CHEM PHARM FAB [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1,2,4 * * page 3, line 5 - line 21 *; | [A]US5156833 (OSUGI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9318746 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [PA] 1-24* claims 1-14 * | by applicant | EP0372777 | US5156833 | - SUCKER; FUCHS; SPEISER, Pharmazeutische Technologie, THIEME, (1991), pages 673 - 688 | - LIST, Arzneiformenlehre, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1985), pages 8 - 18 | - VOIGT, Lehrbuch der pharmazeutischen Technologie, VCH, (1987), pages 427 - 436 | - RöMPPS CHEMIE-LEXIKON, (1973), vol. 3, pages 1478 - 1479 |