EP0632681 - Metal-coated substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulz-Harder, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing. Hugo-Dietz-Strasse 32 D-91207 Lauf / DE | [1995/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Graf, Helmut Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Graf, Helmut Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/01] | Graf, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Greflingerstrasse 7 D-93055 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107880.0 | 21.05.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | DE19934318241 | 02.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318241 | [1995/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0632681 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0632681 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632681 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K1/053 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09745 (EP,US);
H05K2201/098 (EP,US);
Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2956 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/42] | H05K1/02, H01L23/13, H01L23/373, H05K1/05, H05K3/38, H01L21/48, H01L21/36 | ||
Former IPC [1995/01] | H05K1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/01] | Title | German: | Metallbeschichtetes Substrat | [1995/01] | English: | Metal-coated substrate | [1995/01] | French: | Substrat revêtu de métal | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03145748 ; | [A]JPH0541566 ; | [A]DE3728096 (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO); | [A]DE4004844 (ABB IXYS SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910917), vol. 15, no. 367, Database accession no. (E - 1112), & JP03145748 A 19910620 (NARUMI CHINA CORP.) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930625), vol. 17, no. 337, Database accession no. (E - 1388), & JP05041566 A 19930219 (DOWA MINING CO) [A] * abstract * |