EP0628650 - Process for manufacturing supportless and release agent free thermally activated nonwovens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | Process for manufacturing supportless and release agent free thermally activated nonwovens and their use for bonding different substrates | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/31] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nebe, Volker Auf dem Sand 5 D-53859 Niederkassel / DE | 02 /
Blankenheim, Herbert, Dr. Oststrasse 19 D-41539 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Arend, Günter, Dr. Claudiusstrasse 42 D-41540 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
Sawaryn, Bruno Heinrich-Lübke-Strasse 118 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | [1994/50] | Application number, filing date | 94108039.2 | 25.05.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | DE19934318887 | 07.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318887 | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628650 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628650 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/56 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
D04H1/435 (EP);
D04H1/4358 (EP);
D04H1/724 (EP);
D04H3/009 (EP);
D04H3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von träger- und trennmittelfreien, thermoaktivierbaren Vliesen | [1998/45] | English: | Process for manufacturing supportless and release agent free thermally activated nonwovens | [1999/31] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication sans support et sans agents anti-adhésifs d'un non tissé themofusible | [1998/45] |
Former [1994/50] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von träger- und trennmittelfreien, thermoaktivierbaren Vliesen sowie deren Verwendung zum Verkleben unterschiedlicher Substrate | ||
Former [1994/50] | Process for manufacturing supportless and release agent free thermally activated nonwovens and their use for bonding different substrates | ||
Former [1994/50] | Procédé pour la fabrication sans support et sans agents anti-adhésifs d'un non tissé thermofusible ainsi que l'application pour coller des supports différents | Examination procedure | 17.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6440655 ; | [X]JPH0376856 ; | [X]JPH0247306 ; | [A]JPH03130452 ; | [X]WO9201094 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2243288 (CLUPAK INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE2042202 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]GB1161746 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 12, no. 89, Database accession no. 89090040, & JPS6440655 A 19870804 (KURARAY) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 19, no. 91, Database accession no. 91138120, & JPH0376856 A 19910402 (KURARAY) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 13, no. 90, Database accession no. 90095517, & JPH0247306 A 19880803 (KURARAY) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 28, no. 91, Database accession no. 91204879, & JPH03130452 A 19891016 (ASAHI) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |