EP0626413 - Method for the preparation of diorganopolysiloxanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Company, Limited Mitsui Bldg. No. 6, 2-3-16, Nihonbashi-Muromachi, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [1994/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okawa, Tadashi, Main Office for Research and Dev. Toray Dow Corn. Sil. Co. Ltd., 2-2, Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr. Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94108226.5 | 27.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930151052 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: JP 15105293 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0626413 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0626413 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626413 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/06, C08G77/08, C08G77/16, C08G77/12 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
C08G77/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/08 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Diorganopolysiloxanen | [1994/48] | English: | Method for the preparation of diorganopolysiloxanes | [1994/48] | French: | Méthode pour préparer des diorganopolysiloxanes | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JPH0292933 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [A]EP0362710 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0455163 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 * | [A] - Die Makromolekulare Chemie 193(1992) Sep,No 9 pp2453-2466, Maschke et al "Synthesis of high- molecular-weight poly(dimethylsiloxane) of uni- form size by anionic polymerization" *whole doc* [A] 1 |