EP0634591 - Control method and device for an automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heid, Gerhard Seestrasse 4 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Seidel, Willi Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 101 D-71735 Eberdingen-Hochdorf / DE | [1995/03] | Application number, filing date | 94108365.1 | 31.05.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | DE19934324091 | 17.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4324091 | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634591 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634591 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634591 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H61/00 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0096 (EP,US);
F16H59/141 (EP,US);
F16H59/24 (EP,US);
F16H59/42 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern eines automatischen Getriebes | [1995/03] | English: | Control method and device for an automatic transmission | [1995/03] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de commande d'une boîte de vitesses automatique | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3922051 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3334716 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0471102 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column W *; | [A]EP0532365 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,9,10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 43 * | [DA] - WELTER, ANDREAS ET AL., "Die adaptive Getriebesteuerung für die Automatikgetriebe der BMW Fahrzeuge mit Zwölfzilindermotor", DE-Z AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (199209), pages 428 - 436, XP002001206 [DA] 1,4,9,10 |