EP0614617 - Canned product sterilizing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY Campbell Place Camden, NJ 08103-1799 / US | [1994/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mignogna, Michael S. 18 Hawthorne Drive Medford, NJ 08055 / US | 02 /
Santana, Stephen 117 Wilson Road Maple Shade, NJ 08052 / US | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Richards, Michèle E., et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Badcock, Michèle, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94108678.7 | 13.12.1990 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | US19900470601 | 26.01.1990 Original published format: US 470601 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0614617 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0614617 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/04, A23L3/02, A23L1/39 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
A23L3/00 (EP,US);
A23L3/02 (EP,US);
A23L3/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/37] | A23L3/04, A23L3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Sterilisierung von Dosenprodukten | [1994/37] | English: | Canned product sterilizing process | [1994/37] | French: | Procédé de stérilisation de conserves en boîte | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/44] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90313578.8 / EP0438885 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5995875 ; | [A]JPS5894356 ; | [X]GB1173333 (INTERNAT MACHINERY CORP [BE]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, line 82 - line 95 *; | [A]DE2007972 (INTERNATIONAL MACHINERY CORPORATION) [A] 4 * claim 17 *; | [X]DE2144778 (ALFA-LAVAL A.B.) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3959514 (EASTMAN JAMES E) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [X]EP0292045 (STORK AMSTERDAM [NL]) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 28, Database accession no. 84-173916, & JPS5995875 A 19840602 (S. HAYAKAWA ET AL.) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 28, Database accession no. 83-708556, & JPS5894356 A 19830604 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA) [A] 7 * abstract * |