EP0635234 - Arrangement comprising a towel dispenser and a collecting container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/04] | Towel dispenser | ||
[1998/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAUERHAMMER GmbH Hagdornweg 3 D-71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [1995/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauerhammer, Hartmut Hagdornweg 3 D-71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [1998/23] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 11 65 D-71697 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94108908.8 | 10.06.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | DE19930011032U | 23.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9311032 U | [1995/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635234 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635234 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635234 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/24 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
A47K10/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Anordnung bestehend aus einem Handtuchspender und einem Sammelbehälter | [1998/38] | English: | Arrangement comprising a towel dispenser and a collecting container | [1998/38] | French: | Disposition avec un distributeur de serviettes et un récipient collecteur | [1998/38] |
Former [1995/04] | Handtuchspender | ||
Former [1995/04] | Towel dispenser | ||
Former [1995/04] | Distributeur de serviettes | Examination procedure | 24.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CH547085 (RIWISA AG) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,2 * [A] 9; | [Y]US1468667 (DAVID LEIBOW, et al) [Y] 11,12 * page 2, line 20 - line 94; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3017055 (ALEXANDER BABIN) [A] 3 * column 1, line 50 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB1180434 (ERIC CORNER LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 1, line 8 - line 11 * * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 11 * [Y] 7,8,10-12; | [A]FR2236463 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [A] 13* page 1, line 22 - line 39; figure - *; | [A]US4706845 (SCHNURER DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]AT393614B (HARTL GUENTER [AT]) [Y] 10 * the whole document * |