EP0635419 - Front bearing assembly for a tilt cab truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEYR Nutzfahrzeuge AG Schönauerstrasse 5, Postfach 222 A-4400 Steyr / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG Schönauerstrasse 5, Postfach 222 A-4400 Steyr / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenzl, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Parkweg 6 A-4048 Puchenau / AT | 02 /
Burgholzer, Johann Kirchenplatz 11 A-4442 Kleinraming / AT | [1995/04] | Application number, filing date | 94108929.4 | 10.06.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | AT19930001474 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: AT 147493 | [1995/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635419 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635419 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B62D33/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Vordere Lageranordnung für ein kippbares Fahrerhaus eines Lastkraftwagens | [1995/04] | English: | Front bearing assembly for a tilt cab truck | [1995/04] | French: | Dispositif de palier avant pour la cabine basculante d'un camion | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE4300757 (IVECO MAGIRUS) [E] 1 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 30; figure 3 *; | [A]DE2229436 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph L; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0355346 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [A] * abstract * |