EP0630609 - Blood lancet device for obtaining blood samples for diagnosis purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lange, Hans Roemerstrasse 99D D-68623 Lampertheim / DE | 02 /
Argauer, Herbert Hochdorf 24 D-92712 Pirk / DE | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter Patentanwälte Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany, Patentanwälte Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1994/52] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter Patentanwälte Dr. Moser und Dr. Pfeifer Nowackanlage 15 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109001.1 | 13.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934320463 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320463 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0630609 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0630609 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630609 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/15128 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/52] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Blutlanzettenvorrichtung zur Entnahme von Blut für Diagnosezwecke | [1994/52] | English: | Blood lancet device for obtaining blood samples for diagnosis purposes | [1994/52] | French: | Dispositif à lancette pour prélèvements sanguins a des fins de diagnostique | [2001/01] |
Former [1994/52] | Dispositif pour le prélèvement du sang par lancette destiné à un but diagnostique | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 13.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 11.10.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 04.10.2001 | DK | 04.01.2002 | PT | 04.01.2002 | GR | 05.01.2002 | LU | 13.06.2002 | BE | 30.06.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | IE | 04.10.2001 | |
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
LU | 13.06.2002 | ||
BE | 30.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | IE | 04.10.2001 | |
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
BE | 30.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | IE | 04.10.2001 | |
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 04.10.2001 | |
PT | 04.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1085141 (ROEHR PRODUCTS COMPANY INC) [A] 1,2,4-6 * page 2, line 51 - line 93 * * page 2, line 124 - page 3, line 44 *; | [A]EP0458451 (RYDER INT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 23 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 56 *; | [AP]WO9319671 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [AP] 1,2,4-6,8 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 14 * * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 3 *; | [AP]EP0565970 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1 * abstract * * column 10, line 18 - line 23 ** column 14, line 12 - line 45 * |