EP0629660 - Process for preparing synthetic resin powder having improved blocking resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takaki, Akira 1-2-13-202, Kotoku-cho, Nada-ku Koba-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Mori, Toshiyuki 31-17, Shioya-cho 6-chome Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Shimatani, Toshiro 24-10, Mihonosato Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Toshihiko 6-3-23, Kitahonjo, Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109089.6 | 14.06.1994 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | JP19930147882 | 18.06.1993 Original published format: JP 14788293 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629660 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629660 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04, C08L55/02, C08J3/00 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
C08J3/005 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/02 (KR);
C08L25/14 (EP,US);
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kunstharzpulver mit verbesserter Blockierungsfestigkeit | [1994/51] | English: | Process for preparing synthetic resin powder having improved blocking resistance | [1994/51] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une poudre de résine synthétique ayant une résistance au blocage améliorée | [1994/51] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0506036 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [DA] 1-3 * claim - * * example - * * page 3, line 33 - line 39 *; | [DA]EP0066382 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [DA] 1-5 * claim - * * example - *; | [A]EP0418685 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim - * * example - * |