EP0630871 - Thickener combinations for building products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/51] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schermann, Walter, Dr. Christian-Lechleitner-Strasse 18 D-55128 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Miller, Dennis, Dr. Breslauer Strasse 20 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Hilgenfeldt, Eckhard Hermann-Löns-Strasse 43 D-65201 Wiesbaden / DE | 04 /
Böhme-Kovac, Jozef Niersteiner Strasse 25 D-55278 Dexheim / DE | [1994/52] | Application number, filing date | 94109159.7 | 15.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934320508 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320508 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630871 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630871 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B24/38, C09D7/12, // (C04B28/02, 24:32, 24:38),(C04B28/02, 24:16, 24:38),(C04B28/02, 24:12, 24:38),(C04B28/02, 24:04, 24:38) | [1994/52] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B24/383 (EP,US);
C09D7/44 (EP,US);
C04B2103/44 (EP,US);
C08L1/284 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B24/226, C04B24/383, C04B40/0039 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B24/383, C04B40/0039, C04B2103/402 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B24/383, C04B40/0039, C04B2103/404 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B24/383, C04B40/0039, C04B2103/406 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Verdickerkombinationen für Baustoffprodukte | [1994/52] | English: | Thickener combinations for building products | [1994/52] | French: | Combinaisons d'agents épaississants pour produits de construction | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5499135 ; | JPS52102366 [ ] (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [A]EP0314118 (AQUALON CO [US]) [A] 1,13 * Zusammenfassung *; | [DA]EP0390240 (BEROL NOBEL AB [SE]) [DA] 1-10,13 * page 3, line 28 - line 30; examples 1,7 *; | [A]DE3920025 (AQUALON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11-13 * Zusammenfassung *; | [A]WO9203120 (WELLA AG [DE]); | [A]EP0504870 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | JPH06236055 [ ] (IND TECH RES INST) | [X] - N. TANAKA ET AL., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780626), vol. 88, no. 26, Database accession no. 196432b, page 328 [X] 1,3,11-13 * abstract * | [A] - M. TANAKA ET AL., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871102), vol. 107, no. 18, Database accession no. 160386m, page 393 [A] 1,11-13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 37, Database accession no. 79-67105B, & JPS5499135 A 00000000 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [A] * abstract * |