EP0630578 - Pigmentation with carotenoids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhard, Kurt 11 Bündtenstrasse CH-4419 Lupsingen / CH | 02 /
Broz, Jiri 56 Gartenweg CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 03 /
Hengartner, Urs 28 Binzenstrasse CH-4058 Basle / CH | 04 /
Kreienbühl, Paul 69 Chrischonaweg CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 05 /
Schiedt, Katharina 24 Brachmattstrasse CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Kellenberger, Marcus, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Kellenberger, Marcus, Dr., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 94109248.8 | 16.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | EP19930110074 | 24.06.1993 Original published format: EP 93110074 | EP19940106738 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: EP 94106738 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0630578 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0630578 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630578 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, C07C49/24, C07C403/16 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
F02G1/0445 (EP,US);
A23K20/179 (EP,US);
C07C403/16 (EP,US);
C07C45/74 (EP,US);
C07C49/24 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/74, C07C49/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Pigmentierung mit Carotinoiden | [1994/52] | English: | Pigmentation with carotenoids | [1994/52] | French: | Pigmentation avec des caroténoides | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4100739 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,7-11 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9312249 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [PA] 1,4,5,9-11 * page 6, line 13 - line 23 * * claim 7 *; | [A] - SHINICHI TAKAICHI ET AL., "Light-induced changes of carotenoid pigments in anaerobic cells of the aerobic photosynthetic bacterium, Roseobacter denitrificans (Erythrobacter species OCh 114): reduction of spheroidenone to 3,4-dihydrospheroidenone", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, DE, vol. 155, no. 5, pages 473 - 476 [A] 1,2 * page 473, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * | [DA] - JACQUELINE MANWARING ET AL., "The identification of desmethylspheroidenone as a major carotenoid in aerobic cultures of Rhodopseudomonas capsulata", FEBS LETTERS, NL, vol. 110, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(80)80019-6, pages 47 - 49, XP025592670 [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(80)80019-6 | [DA] - NOËL ARPIN ET AL., "Recherches chimiotaxinomiques sur les champignons. Fungal carotenoids. III-Nouveaux caroténoides, notamment sous forme d'esters tertiaires, isolés de PLECTANIA COCCINEA (SCOP. EX FR.) FUCK.", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, GB, vol. 6, no. 7, pages 995 - 1005 [DA] 1,2 * page 996, Formula VIII * |