EP0633332 - Lubricating apparatus for flat bars of a wander flat carding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demuth, Robert Maulackerstrasse 17 CH-8309 Nürensdorf / CH | 02 /
Sauter, Christian Lächenstrasse 20 CH-8247 Flurlingen / CH | 03 /
Faas, Jürg Seuzacherstrasse 16 CH-8474 Dinhard / CH | [1995/02] | Application number, filing date | 94109357.7 | 17.06.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | CH19930002025 | 06.07.1993 Original published format: CH 202593 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633332 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/24 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
D01G15/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1995/02] | Title | German: | Schmiervorrichtung für Deckelstäbe einer Wanderdeckelkarde | [1995/02] | English: | Lubricating apparatus for flat bars of a wander flat carding machine | [1995/02] | French: | Appareil de lubrification pour barres de chapeaux d'une machine de cardage à chapeaux mobiles | [1995/02] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 04.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/41] | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2678112 (DANIEL MC,Q.G.) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 18; figures 1,3,6 *; | [Y]GB1315371 (T.M.M.(RESEARCH)) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 10 - line 71; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE1560250 (MERRIMAN INC.) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE533302 (HOFMANN,C.FA.) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0367970 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) |