EP0635494 - 2-(Imidazol-1-yl)2-benzylethylidene-aminooxyalkyl-hydroxamic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states PHARMACIA S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 I-20152 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.r.l. Via Carlo Imbonati 24 I-20159 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cozzi, Paolo via Zanella 48/5 I-20133 Milan / IT | 02 /
Giordani, Antonio via Ceva 18 I-27100 Pavia / IT | 03 /
Salvati, Patricia via Valera 16 I-20020 Arese (Milan) / IT | 04 /
Bassini, Domenico Fusar piazza 25 Aprile 7 I-26010 Montodine (Cremona) / IT | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Ferrario, Vittorino Pharmacia & Upjohn S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department, Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Ferrario, Vittorino Pharmacia S.p.A. Patent Department Via Bisceglie, 104 I-20152 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/04] | Ferrario, Vittorino Pharmacia S.p.A. Patent Department Via Bisceglie, 104 I-20152 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94109475.7 | 20.06.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | GB19930015058 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9315058 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635494 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/61, A61K31/415 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | 2-(Imidazol-1-yl)-2-benzylethylidene-aminooxyalkyl-hydroxam säure Derivate | [1995/04] | English: | 2-(Imidazol-1-yl)2-benzylethylidene-aminooxyalkyl-hydroxamic acid derivatives | [1995/04] | French: | 2-(Imidazol-1-yl)-2-benzyléthylidène-aminooxyalkyle derivés d'acide hydroxamique | [1995/04] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/18] | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0526200 (FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.R.L.) [DY] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9113062 (FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.R.L.) [DY] 1-9 *see the whole document, especially definitions of R1*; | [A]EP0499444 (FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.P.A.) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0142653 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0007678 (ACF CHEMIEFARMA NV) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |