EP0638349 - Use of a zeolite for preventing poisoning of combustion engine exhaust gas purification catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/07] | Process to prevent combustion engine exhaust gas purification catalysts from poisoning | ||
[1998/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Dieter, Dr. Fürstenbergstrasse 2 D-63457 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Grünaustrasse 9 D-63457 Hanau / DE | 03 /
Engler, Bernd, Dr. Treuener Strasse 2 D-63457 Hanau / DE | 04 /
Ostgathe, Klaus Auf der Beun 14 a D-65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1995/07] | Application number, filing date | 94110065.3 | 29.06.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | DE19934326121 | 04.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326121 | [1995/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638349 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638349 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/94, F01N3/28 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/9481 (EP,KR);
F01N13/009 (EP,KR);
F01N3/0814 (EP,KR);
F01N2250/12 (EP,KR);
F01N2330/02 (EP,KR);
F01N2330/06 (EP,KR);
F01N2370/24 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/07] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Zeolithen zum Schutz eines Katalysators für die Reinigung der Abgase von Verbrennungskraftmaschinen vor Katalysatorgiften | [1998/33] | English: | Use of a zeolite for preventing poisoning of combustion engine exhaust gas purification catalyst | [1998/33] | French: | Utilisation d' un zéolite pour empecher l'empoisonnement de catalysateurs de purification de gaz d' échappement de moteurs à combustion | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/07] | Verfahren zum Schutz von Katalysatoren für die Reinigung der Abgase von Verbrennungskraftmaschinen vor Katalysatorgiften | ||
Former [1995/07] | Process to prevent combustion engine exhaust gas purification catalysts from poisoning | ||
Former [1995/07] | Procédé de prévention d'empoisonnement des catalyseurs de purification de gaz d'échappement des moteurs à combustion | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3842282 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 39; claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0439010 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 12 - page 6, line 2; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2376698 (ENGELHARD MIN & CHEM [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 25 *; | [A]EP0161743 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 4; figures 1,2; claims 1-20 *; | [A]JPH02149715 ; | [A]EP0149966 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-6 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE3719138 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1-12 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 29, Database accession no. 90-220900, & JPH02149715 A 19900608 (TOYO KOGYO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | EP0541271 | DE4039952 |