EP0631788 - Gel-like fragrance composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | For all designated states NIHON FIRMENICH KABUSHIKI KAISHA 12-15, 4 chome, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | ||
For all designated states NIHON FIRMENICH KABUSHIKI KAISHA 12-15, 4 chome, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaoka, Toru, Nippon Shokubau Hamada-shataku G-404, 931-11, Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tahara, Hideyuki 3-1-49, Minamieguchi, Yodagawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Shinohara, Masahiko 2-12, Monzen Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1995/01] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110244.4 | 01.07.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | JP19930164653 | 02.07.1993 Original published format: JP 16465393 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631788 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04, A61L9/01 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
A61L9/042 (EP,US);
A61L9/01 (EP,US);
A61L9/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/01] | Title | German: | Parfumzusammensetzung in Form eines Gels | [1995/01] | English: | Gel-like fragrance composition | [1995/01] | French: | Composition de parfum sous forme de gel | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 05.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/32] | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0515777 ; | [A]US4362841 (MINATONO SHOBU, et al) [A] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0152982 (NAARDEN INTERNATIONAL NV [NL]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 26 - line 40 * * page 4 * * page 6 *; | [Y]US5034222 (KELLETT GEORGE W [US], et al) [Y] 1-11; | [DA]EP0441512 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1 * claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 09, Database accession no. 93-070333, & JPH0515777 A 19930126 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * |