EP0634119 - Furniture piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/03] | Connecting piece | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORST HÄUSSER METALLWAREN GmbH Daimlerstrasse 17 D-73635 Rudersberg / DE | [1995/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häusser, Horst Daimlerstrasse 17 D-73635 Rudersberg / DE | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110343.4 | 04.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | DE19930010033U | 06.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9310033 U | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634119 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634119 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47B13/02, F16B12/44 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
F16B12/02 (EP);
A47B13/02 (EP);
F16B12/40 (EP);
A47B2200/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1995/03] | Title | German: | Möbelstück | [1998/19] | English: | Furniture piece | [1998/19] | French: | Pièce de meuble | [1998/19] |
Former [1995/03] | Verbindungsstück | ||
Former [1995/03] | Connecting piece | ||
Former [1995/03] | Pièce de connection | Examination procedure | 08.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.05.1998 | FR | 06.05.1998 | NL | 06.05.1998 | LU | 04.07.1998 | BE | 31.07.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 06.05.1998 | |
FR | 06.05.1998 | ||
NL | 06.05.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 06.05.1998 | |
NL | 06.05.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 06.05.1998 | |
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | BE | 31.07.1998 | |
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 31.07.1998 | |
FR | 02.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 02.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0353175 (DEMOLIN JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 9; figure 2 *[A] 7 | Examination | EP0467236 |