EP0633507 - Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge using same and electrophotographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakata, Kouichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Toshihiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Senoo, Akihiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kanemaru, Tetsuro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110681.7 | 08.07.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | JP19930170460 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17046093 | [1995/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633507 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633507 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
G03G5/0637 (EP,US);
G03G5/06142 (EP,US);
G03G5/0629 (EP,US);
G03G5/0607 (EP,US);
G03G5/0681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/02] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches, lichtempfindliches Element, und dieses benutzende Prozesskartusche, und elektrophotographisches Gerät | [1995/02] | English: | Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge using same and electrophotographic apparatus | [1995/02] | French: | Elément photosensible électrophotographique, cartouche de traitement l'utilisant, et appareil électrophotographique | [1995/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.02.1997 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0449741 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 3 - page 6; examples 1-27 * * claims 10,11 *; | [A]EP0482884 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 6 - page 19; examples 1-54 * * claims 13,14 *; | [A]EP0504794 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 35; examples 2-64 * * claims 15,19 * |