EP0634272 - Inkjet recording apparatus having an electrostatic actuator and method of driving it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-08 / JP | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuji, Masahiro, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | 02 /
Miyashita, Ikuhiro, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | 03 /
Koeda, Hiroshi, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
Former [1995/03] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110726.0 | 11.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930174508 | 14.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17450893 | JP19930178140 | 19.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17814093 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634272 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634272 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634272 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B41J2/04536 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/14314 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/04541 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/04578 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/025 (KR);
B41J2/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät mit elektrostatischem Betätiger und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [1995/03] | English: | Inkjet recording apparatus having an electrostatic actuator and method of driving it | [1995/03] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement par jet d'encre avec un actionneur électrostatique et son procédé de commande | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4577201 (MURAKAMI KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]EP0437106 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1,2* column W *; | [Y]EP0479441 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * |