EP0635453 - Multipurpose supporting element for bottle capsule applicators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBINO & GALANDRINO S.p.A. Viale Italia, 140/142 I-14053 Canelli (Asti) / IT | [1995/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galandrino, Agostino Viale Risorgimento, 144 I-14053 Canelli (Asti) / IT | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94110749.2 | 11.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00174U | 21.07.1993 Original published format: IT TO930174 U | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635453 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635453 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B67B5/03 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B67B5/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [1995/04] | Title | German: | Mehrzweck-Trägerelement für Flaschenkapsel-Applikator | [1995/04] | English: | Multipurpose supporting element for bottle capsule applicators | [1995/04] | French: | Support multiusage pour applicateurs de capsules de surbouchage | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2626459 (KRONSEDER) [A] 1,8 * page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0366956 (OTTO SICK GMBH) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 4 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3615532 (KRONES AG HERMANN KRONSEDER MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2548976 (FA. CARL PIRZER) [A] 1,8 * page 3, paragraph 1; figure 2 * |