EP0634112 - Cigarette filling optical control method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Pomponia 10 I-40133 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states G.D Società per Azioni Via Pomponia 10 I-40100 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghini, Marco Via Galletta, 46/B I-40068 S. Lazzaro di Savena / IT | 02 /
Di Stefano, Giuseppe Via Marconi, 188 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
Neri, Armando Via Napoli, 7 I-40100 Bologna / IT | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94110821.9 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | IT1993BO00320 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: IT BO930320 | [1995/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634112 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634112 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634112 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0634112 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/34, G01N21/88 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
A24C5/3412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Optische Prüfvorrichtung für die Füllung von Zigaretten | [1995/03] | English: | Cigarette filling optical control method and device | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif d'inspection optique pour le remplissage des cigarettes | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32 21033 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Niedmers & Seemann Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32 21033 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, Niedmers & Seemann, Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3 22767 Hamburg / DE | 04.10.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.03.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.02.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3812349 (GUGLIOTTA G, et al) [A] 1,8 * column W *; | [A]US3818223 (GIBSON G, et al) [A] 1,8* column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2176598 (KOERBER AG) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0370231 (SASIB SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8 * column W *; | [A] - DISCLOSED ANONYMOUSLY, "ABTASTEINRICHTUNG FÜR SCHNITTFLÄCHEN", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH (GB), (198509), no. 257, page 424, XP002001003 [A] 1,8 * page 424 * | Examination | - Warnecke H.-J; Keferstein C.P.; Schreiber L.: "wt Zeitschrift fuer industrielle Fertigung", Springer Verlag, 1986, pages 461-466, 'Moeglichkeiten der Bildverarbeitung in der Koordinatenmesstechnik' | - Schulze Karlheinz: 'Experimentelle Messtechnik im Maschinen- und Stahlbau', first edition, Berlin: Verlag Technik, 1988, pages 26-27 | Opposition | - Experimental Techniques, Oct.1986, pages 22-25, "Position/Dimension by Structured Light", C. Silvaggi, F. Luk and W. North | - H.-J. Warnecke, C.P. Keferstein, L. Schreiber in "wt Zeitschrift fuer industrielle Fertigung", Springer Verlag, 1986, pages 461-466, "Moeglichkeiten der Bildverarbeitunt in der Koordinatenmesstechnik" | - J. Slavik, H. Hoefler, in "Feinwerktechnik & Messtechnik 96", Carl Hanser Verlag, Muenchen, 1988 (10), pages 415-419, "Optische Formmesstechnik mit Koordinatenmessgeraeten". | - "Handbuch der industriellen Messtechnik", 5th edition, R. Oldenburg Verlag Muenchen Wien, 1992 edited by Prof.Dr. Paul Profos ETH Zuerich and Prof. Dr.-Ing.Dr.h.c. Tilo Pfeifer RWTH Aachen, pages 451, 452 | - Karlheinz Schulze, "Experimentelle Messtechnik in Maschinen- und Stahlbau", first edition, Berlin: Verlag Technik, 1988 pages 26, 27 | - Volkmar Linse, Ernst Schmidberger, Stuttgart, "Methoden der beruehrungslosen Pruefung in der Produktion von Leiterplattenbaugruppen" in Qualitaetstechnik, Carl Hanser Verlag Muenchen, 1991, pages 270.276 |