EP0635430 - Device for feeding a waste sorting plant with the contents of garbage bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gassner, Benno Schusterstrasse 15 D-85655 Göggenhofen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Gassner, Benno D-85655 Göggenhofen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 85540 Haar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 D-85540 Haar / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111042.1 | 15.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | DE19934323952 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4323952 | [1995/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635430 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635430 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B02C18/0076 (EP,US);
B65B69/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beschicken einer Müllsortiereinrichtung mit dem Inhalt von Müllsäcken | [1995/04] | English: | Device for feeding a waste sorting plant with the contents of garbage bags | [1995/04] | French: | Dispositif pour alimenter une installation de tri de déchets avec les contenus de sacs-poubelles | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2325203 (R UTI R SRL) [DA] 1,6* page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2307634 (R UTI R SRL [IT]) [A] 1,6,13 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 18 * * page 3, line 6 - line 14; figure - *; | [A]FR2530972 (BELOIT CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,8,15 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 14; figure - *; | [DA]GB2206297 (HENLEY BURROWES & COMPANY LIMI) [DA] 1,7,9,13,15 * the whole document * |