EP0635907 - Filtered electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECTRUM CONTROL, INC. 8031 Avonia Road Fairview Pennsylvania 16411 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Spectrum Control, Inc. 8031 Avonia Road Fairview, Pennsylvania 16411 / US | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Hung Thai 638 Luther Road Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17111 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Moir, Michael Christopher Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111180.9 | 18.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930093832 | 19.07.1993 Original published format: US 93832 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635907 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635907 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635907 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/719 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
H01R13/7195 (EP,US);
H01R13/6583 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | Gefilterter elektrischer Verbinder | [1995/04] | English: | Filtered electrical connector | [1995/04] | French: | Connecteur électrique filtré | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.1999 | 01.08.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.2000 | FR | 02.11.2000 | IT | 02.11.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 02.11.2000 | |
FR | 02.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.11.2000 | |
FR | 30.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | FR | 30.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3985413 (EVANS WILLIAM ROBERT) [AD] 1-8 * abstract *; | [AD]WO8603893 (AMP INC [US]) [AD] * the whole document *; | [A]US4726790 (HADJIS GEORGE C [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0398807 (AMPHENOL CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0437296 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 4,8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5151054 (BRIONES FRANCISCO R [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * |