EP0627369 - Cargo container with bulkhead and multiple, braced and heated liners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Podd, Victor T., Sr. 255 Beverly Avenue Montreal Quebec / CA | For all designated states Podd, Victor I., Jr. 6217-2 Bay Club Drive Fort Lauderdale Florida 33308 / US | For all designated states Podd, Stephen D. 255 Beverly Avenue Montreal Quebec / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states Podd, Victor T., Sr. 255 Beverly Avenue Montreal, Quebec / CA | ||
For all designated states Podd, Victor I., Jr. 6217-2 Bay Club Drive Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33308 / US | |||
For all designated states Podd, Stephen D. 255 Beverly Avenue Montreal, Quebec / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111264.1 | 11.02.1991 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | US19900482030 | 15.02.1990 Original published format: US 482030 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0627369 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0627369 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/00, B65D90/04, B65D88/74 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
B65D90/048 (EP,US);
B65D90/047 (EP,US);
B65D2590/046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/49] | B65D90/04, B65D88/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/49] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Schott und mehreren, verankerten und geheizten Auskleidungen | [1994/49] | English: | Cargo container with bulkhead and multiple, braced and heated liners | [1994/49] | French: | Conteneur avec cloison et une pluralité de doublures ancrées et chauffées | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 01.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/10] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91918071.1 / EP0537298 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.1996 | 28.02.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3578213 (CLARKE EDWIN E, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - line 20; figure 3 * * column 6, line 29 - line 71 *; | [XAY]DE1951888 (SCHOLTZ AG CONRAD) [X] 4,6-8 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 3; figure - * * page 7, paragraph L * [A] 1-3,5 [Y] 9,10; | [Y]DE2813064 (GUMMI HEINMUELLER GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 9,10 * page 4, paragraph L; figure - *; | [XA]US4441627 (TAKEUCHI SEIJI [CA]) [X] 7,8 * column A; figures 1,15-17 * [A] 1; | [XA]EP0331491 (BTR DUNLOP LIMITED [ZA]) [X] 7,8 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 * [A] 1 |