EP0635588 - Improved method for growing silicon crystal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive (O'Fallon) P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive (O'Fallon) P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiteru, Tamida 501 Pearl Drive, Post Office Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Meyer, Joachim Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Standort Troisdorf Postfach 13 47 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111268.2 | 20.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930095759 | 21.07.1993 Original published format: US 95759 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635588 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635588 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/04, C30B29/06 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
C30B15/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/04] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur Bildung von Siliconkristallen | [1995/04] | English: | Improved method for growing silicon crystal | [1995/04] | French: | Procédé perfectionné pour la croissance de cristaux de silicium | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.11.1998 | DK | 18.02.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 18.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0170788 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 9 | [XY] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [X] 1-5 [Y] 9 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [Y] 9 |