EP0626487 - Device for the insulation and sealing of building facades comprising joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYCKERHOFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Biebricher Strasse 69 D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [1994/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111312.8 | 16.04.1992 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | DE19914121457 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121457 | [1994/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0626487 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0626487 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626487 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0626487 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/04, E04B1/76 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/762 (EP);
E04F13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, LU, SE [1994/48] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Dämmen und Dichten von Fugen aufweisenden Bauwerksfassaden | [1994/48] | English: | Device for the insulation and sealing of building facades comprising joints | [1994/48] | French: | Dispositif pour isoler et étanchéifier les façades de bâtiments comportants des joints | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92106684.1 / EP0520152 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.01.1999 | SE | 07.01.1999 | DK | 07.04.1999 | AT | 16.04.1999 | LU | 16.04.1999 | BE | 30.04.1999 | CH | 30.04.1999 | LI | 30.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | SE | 07.01.1999 | |
DK | 07.04.1999 | ||
AT | 16.04.1999 | ||
LU | 16.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | SE | 07.01.1999 | |
DK | 07.04.1999 | ||
AT | 16.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 07.01.1999 | |
AT | 16.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 16.04.1999 | |
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 30.04.1999 | |
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 30.04.1999 | |
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | FR | 04.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1438746 (PLASTIQUES ET RESINES APPLIQUE) [A] 10* page 1, column L, line 11 - column R, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]FR2378152 (BASF FARBEN & FASERN [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4-6,8 * page 3, line 4 - page 8, line 34; figures 1-2 *; | [DA]FR2394651 (DUFOUR ET FILS ANC ETS MARIUS [FR]) [DA] 2,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 4 - line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3006724 (LEFFER DIETMAR) [A] 2,5 * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 1; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2484500 (HUGOT JEANNE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2539785 (STRATI FRANCE [FR]) [A] 5,6,8,9 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 3; figure 2 * |