EP0641092 - Data transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/51] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiner, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Säulenstrasse 2 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Klaus Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Westphal, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111413.4 | 21.07.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | DE19934328913 | 27.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4328913 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641092 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641092 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, G08C17/04 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
H04B5/22 (EP);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
G08C17/04 (EP);
G07C2009/00611 (EP);
G07C2009/00777 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/09] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungssystem | [1995/09] | English: | Data transmission system | [1995/09] | French: | Système de transmission de données | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | ES | 27.06.2002 | AT | 21.07.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | GB | 19.12.2001 | |
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 21.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GB | 19.12.2001 | |
AT | 21.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 19.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3427614 (VINDING JORGEN P) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 5 - line 46; figure 1; claims 1,7 *; | [XY]WO8803687 (AUDEMARS S A R [CH]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,2,5; claims 1,2 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US5144299 (SMITH DAVID C [US]) [Y] 4* column 2, line 35 - line 65; figure 1 * |