EP0636471 - Method for producing of a laminated glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/05] | Laminated glass and method for its production | ||
[2000/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyasaka, Seiichi, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Hiroyuki, Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111661.8 | 26.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | JP19930204482 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20448293 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636471 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636471 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C17/30 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B17/10688 (EP,US);
B32B17/10908 (EP,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
B32B2375/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31598 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eineS VerbundglasES | [2001/12] | English: | Method for producing of a laminated glass | [2000/24] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un verre laminé | [2000/24] |
Former [1995/05] | Verbundglas und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1995/05] | Laminated glass and method for its production | ||
Former [1995/05] | Verre laminé et procédé pour sa production | Examination procedure | 13.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 03.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3959533 (KITAJ WALTER) [A] 1,8,11 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 5; claim 1 *; | [X]US4144376 (BECKMANN ROLF, et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * column 3, line 7 - line 26 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 62 * * column 5, line 50 - line 63; claim - *; | [A]EP0171917 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]EP0252233 (IBM [US]) [A] 3,13 * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 35 *; | [A]EP0548775 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS5727050B | JPS6071252 | JPS6260990B | JPS6260989B | JPS632879B | JPS6331361B | US4944822 | JPH0251922B |