EP0636937 - color developing agent composition and color developer composition for processing silver halide color photographic material and method of using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/05] | Compositions of color developing agent and color developer composition for processing silver halide color photographic material and method of using the same | ||
[1999/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI PHOTO CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 4-6-2, Nihonbashi honcho, chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sigemori, Nobuki 192 Nemoto Matsudo City, Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Sperling, Rüdiger, et al Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Sperling, Rüdiger, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. S. Staeger, Dipl.Ing.Dipl.Wirtsch.Ing. R. Sperling, Müllerstrasse 31 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111729.3 | 27.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | JP19930205788 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20578893 | JP19930205789 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20578993 | JP19930281724 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28172493 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636937 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636937 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/413 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
G03C7/413 (EP,US);
G03C7/4136 (EP,US);
G03C7/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1995/05] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine Farbentwicklersubstanz, Farbentwickler zur Verarbeitung von photographischen Silberhalogenidfarbmaterialien und deren Verwendung | [1995/05] | English: | color developing agent composition and color developer composition for processing silver halide color photographic material and method of using the same | [1999/46] | French: | Composition contenant un agent développateur pour la couleur, révélateur pour le traitement de matériaux photographiques couleur à l'halogénure d'argent et méthode à cet effet | [1995/05] |
Former [1995/05] | Compositions of color developing agent and color developer composition for processing silver halide color photographic material and method of using the same | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.2000 | CH | 04.10.2000 | FR | 04.10.2000 | IT | 04.10.2000 | LI | 04.10.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
CH | 04.10.2000 | ||
FR | 04.10.2000 | ||
LI | 04.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
CH | 04.10.2000 | ||
LI | 04.10.2000 | ||
FR | 02.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
FR | 02.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH0460636 ; | [X]GB1099255 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * claims and examples (compounds (2) and (5)) *; | [X]FR2096241 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-9* example 2 (cyan color developer) *; | [X]US3823017 (HODES H) [X] 1-9 * claim - *; | [X]EP0520457 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * example 8 * | [DX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 15, Database accession no. 92-118619, & JPH0460636 A 19920226 (KONICA CORP.) [DX] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS4537957B | JPS4641676B | JPS4720743B | US3615572 | US3647461 | US3647462 | JPS4824050B | JPS5021250 | JPS6035535 | JPS63136045 | JPH02178833 | JPH03130383 | JPH0437847 | JPH0460636 | JPH0481751 | JPH04147138 | JPH05127330 | JPH05181245 | JPH05188551 | JPH05188552 | JPH11127330 | - Basis of Photographic Industry --- Silver-Salt Photography, CORONA CO., LTD., pages 277 - 278 | - HAIST, Modern Photographic Processing, JOHN WILY AND SONS, (1979), page 545 |