EP0640643 - Organopolysiloxanes and a method of setting hair using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yui, Koji 744-20, Sakata Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 02 /
Takeshige, Mari 1-16-1-302, Yakuendai Funabashi-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Oda, Takashi 674-62, Hironishi Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 04 /
Yoshimatsu, Akira 674-50, Hironishi Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 05 /
Itou, Takashi 2-9-6-303, Motokitakata Ichikawa-shi, Chiba / JP | 06 /
Sato, Nakako 4-7-10-206, Takaidohigashi, Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kure, Naohisa 3-16-1-307, Higashisuna, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112507.2 | 10.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | JP19930198657 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: JP 19865793 | JP19930199361 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: JP 19936193 | JP19930217722 | 01.09.1993 Original published format: JP 21772293 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640643 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640643 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640643 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/26, A61K7/06, C08G77/42 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/452 (EP,US);
C08G77/455 (EP,US);
Y10S424/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/09] | C08G77/26, A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/09] | Title | German: | Organopolysiloxane und ein Verfahren zum Haarfestigen unter Verwendung derselben | [1995/09] | English: | Organopolysiloxanes and a method of setting hair using the same | [1995/09] | French: | Organopolysiloxanes et procédé de fixation de la chevelure les utilisant | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1097453 (DOW CORNING) [A] 1,3,5 * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0166122 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [A] 1,2,10,12,14,15,17 * page 12, line 5 - line 20; example 1; claims 1,4 *; | [D]JPS60240732 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH); | [A]US5220033 (KAMEI MASANAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,12,14,15,17 * column 9, line 32 - line 40; example 4; claim 1 *; | [D]JPH0532784 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0417586 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 7, line 39 * * page 4, line 44 - line 49; claims 1,5 * |