EP0640331 - Closure device for hygienic articles, particularly diaper closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states VP - SCHICKEDANZ AG Schoppershofstrasse 80 D-90489 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Volker Karl-Herold-Strasse 16 D-91301 Forchheim / DE | 02 /
Zimmer, Dagmar St. Jakob-Strasse 5 D-91161 Hiltpolstein / DE | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112557.7 | 11.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | DE19934327589 | 17.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4327589 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640331 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640331 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640331 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/58 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung für Hygieneartikel, insbesondere Windelverschluss | [1995/09] | English: | Closure device for hygienic articles, particularly diaper closure | [1995/09] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture pour produit hygiénique, notamment pour fermeture de couche | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2137855 (JACOB EZEKIEL) [A] 1-3,5,7,11 * page 2, line 33 - page 5, line 10 * * claims 1-8 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4834820 (KONDO TAKAHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7,11 * column W *; | [A]US4522853 (SZONN BODO [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,11 * column W *; | [A]WO8103601 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 22 * * figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE4202704 (SKURNIA UWE DR [DE]) [DA] * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2403036 (CELATOSE SA [FR]) | by applicant | FR2137855 | WO8103601 |