EP0645371 - Process for the separation of L-leucine and L-isoleucine from aqueous solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60387 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60387 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60387 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonsel, Sems, Dr. Sehit Halil Ibrahim Cad. 8 80660 Istinye-Istanbul / TR | 02 /
Richet, Gérard 88, Av. R. Schuman F-02100 Saint-Quentin / FR | 03 /
Schäfer-Treffenfeldt, Wiltrud, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 4 D-63179 Obertshausen 2 / DE | 04 /
Le Quang, Tien 27, Boulevard de la République F-80400 Ham / FR | 05 /
Sextl, Elfriede, Dr. Am Frohnbügel 11 D-63826 Geiselbach / DE | 06 /
Scholz, Mario, Dr. Im Rausch 10 D-63457 Hanau / DE | [1995/13] | Application number, filing date | 94112748.2 | 16.08.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | DE19934332464 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332464 | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645371 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645371 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/40, C07C229/08 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
C07C227/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von L-Leucin und L-Isoleucin aus wässrigen Lösungen | [1995/13] | English: | Process for the separation of L-leucine and L-isoleucine from aqueous solutions | [1995/13] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation de L-leucine et L-isoleucine de solutions aqueuses | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4320181B ; | [A]JPS63246354 ; | [A]JPH05229995 ; | [A]US4910336 (GOODMAN WALTER H [US]) [A] 1 * example - *; | [PA]EP0571742 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [PA] 1,4* the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 68, no. 00, Database accession no. 66-34753F, & JPS4320181B B1 00000000 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 013, no. 056, Database accession no. (C - 566), & JP63246354 A 00000000 (AJINOMOTO CO INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 40, Database accession no. 93-317422, & JPH05229995 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [D] - EP Application 93105321 | [D] - DE Application 4217203 |