EP0648406 - Bearing device for the blade-holders of a lawnmower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OUTILS WOLF 5, rue de l'Industrie 67160 Wissembourg / FR | [1997/43] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states Outils Wolf, Société à responsabilité limitée 5, Rue de l'Industrie F-67160 Wissembourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke, Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Dipl.-Ing. F. Petersen Postfach 40 26 76025 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1995/16] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke, Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Dipl.-Ing. F. Petersen Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112946.2 | 19.08.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | DE19934335240 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4335240 | [1995/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648406 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648406 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/68 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
A01D34/6812 (EP);
A01D2101/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Lagerung für den Messerträger eines Rasenmähers | [1995/16] | English: | Bearing device for the blade-holders of a lawnmower | [1995/16] | French: | Dispositif paliere pour les porte-lames d'une tondeuse à gazon | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.1998 | GB | 19.08.1998 | ES | 20.08.1998 | SE | 20.08.1998 | BE | 31.08.1998 | CH | 31.08.1998 | LI | 31.08.1998 | [2004/28] |
Former [2001/51] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
GB | 19.08.1998 | ||
SE | 20.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 31.08.1998 | ||
LI | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
GB | 19.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 31.08.1998 | ||
LI | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 19.08.1998 | |
GB | 19.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 19.08.1998 | |
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 19.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2885873 (BEESTON JR JOHN T); | [A]US3252304 (MOODY WARREN E); | [DA]FR1509682 (WOLF) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3414094 (HANS HAUSER); | [A]FR2298265 (WOLF GERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 3, line 11 - line 35 *; | [A]US4295327 (BORTOLUSSI EVEREST J) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 64 *; | [A]US4362004 (RUSH JR ROBERT W, et al); | [A]US4570766 (GOLOBAY GARY L [US]); | [A]US5119918 (PARDEE JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 11 * |