EP0640531 - Package for goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korte, Heinrich Am Rennschloot D-26810 Ihrhove / DE | [1995/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian, et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Thiel, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl,Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni, Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112954.6 | 19.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | EP19930113791 | 28.08.1993 Original published format: EP 93113791 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640531 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D73/00, B65D85/42 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B65D73/0021 (EP,US);
B65D85/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | Warenverpackung | [1995/09] | English: | Package for goods | [1995/09] | French: | Emballage pour marchandises | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/07] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9104097U (PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FÜR ELEKTRISCHE GLÜHLAMPEN MBH) [A] 1-3,12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0541831 (KORTE HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]NL7706511 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1 * figure - * |