EP0640863 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uemura, Tsuyoshi 16-3-321, Jyousyouji-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | 02 /
Kosako, Shinnya 16-1-131, Jyousyouji-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 572 / JP | 03 /
Mochizuki, Hideaki 3-34, Kitayama-cho Tennoji-ku, Osaka 543 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Masao 1093, Habu-cho Kishiwada-shi, Osaka 596 / JP | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113000.7 | 19.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | JP19930210174 | 25.08.1993 Original published format: JP 21017493 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640863 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640863 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640863 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/1337 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/133377 (EP,US);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
G02F1/1396 (EP,US);
G02F1/133528 (EP,US);
G02F1/133757 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/09] | G02F1/1333 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1995/09] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung | [1995/09] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1995/09] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.11.2002 | NL | 13.11.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 13.11.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4295712 (ISHIWATARI MASUMI) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0475117 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1 * page 19, column 11 - column 53; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0497619 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * page 7, line 56 - page 8, line 22 *; | [E]EP0626607 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1-9* page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 10 *; | [AD] - Y.TOKO, "TN-LCDs Fabricated by Non-Rubbing...", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS SEATTLE, USA, (19930516), vol. 24, pages 622 - 625, XP000470767 [AD] 1 * the whole document * |