EP0641892 - Crash barrier section made of steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN-PRODUKTIONS-GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO.KG Industriegelände "Über Prims" D-66839 Schmelz-Limbach / DE | [1995/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Karl-Heinz Josef-Marx-Str. 6 D-66636 Hasborn-Dautweiler / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Dieter Moselstr. 5 D-66578 Schiffweiler / DE | [1997/16] |
Former [1995/10] | 01 /
Schmitt, Karl-Heinz Josef-Marx-Str. 6 D-66636 Hasborn-Dautweiler / DE | ||
02 /
Schmitt, Dieter Moselstr. 5 D-66578 Schiffweiler / DE | Representative(s) | Bockermann, Rolf Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 D-44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113007.2 | 20.08.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | DE19934329547 | 02.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4329547 | [1995/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0641892 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0641892 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641892 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/02, E01F15/08 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
E01F15/088 (EP);
E01F15/085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/10] | E01F15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, LI, NL [1996/51] |
Former [1995/10] | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, NL | Title | German: | Stählerner Leitplankenstrang | [1995/10] | English: | Crash barrier section made of steel | [1995/10] | French: | Tronçon de glissière de sécurité d'acier | [1995/10] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3827030 (SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,10 * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 52; figure - *; | [A]EP0414959 (SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0462307 (SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,6,8 * column 9, line 27 - column 11; figure - *; | [A]EP0472847 (SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6* column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 11; figure . * |