EP0648490 - Septicemia suppressing substitution fluid preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Masami 546 Carleton Road 2 Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/16] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113210.2 | 24.08.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | JP19930232529 | 24.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23252993 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648490 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648490 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/16] | Title | German: | Flüssige Ersetzungszusammensetzung zur Unterdrückung von Sepsis | [1995/16] | English: | Septicemia suppressing substitution fluid preparation | [1995/16] | French: | Préparation liquide à substitution pour supprimer la septicémie | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/18] | 09.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0355453 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [YD] 1-11 * page 3, line 27 - line 30 *; | [Y] - R.BERKOW ET AL., ED., The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, 15th ed., RAHWAY, N.J., MERCK & CO., INC., (1987) [Y] 1-11 * page 65 - page 67 * | [XP] - M.BEYLOT ET AL., "Metabolic effects of a D-beta-hydroxybutyrate infusion in septic patients: Inhibition of lipolysis and glucose production but not leucine oxidation", CRIT.CARE MED., (199407), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 1091 - 1098 [XP] 1-11 * page 197, column L, paragraph L * | [X] - J.H.F.SHAW ET AL., "Energy and Substrate Kinetics and Oxidation During Ketone Infusion in Septic Dogs: Role of Changes in Insulin and Glucagon", CIRC.SHOCK, (1984), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 63 - 79 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - A.RADCLIFFE ET AL., "FAILURE OF EXOGENOUS KETONES TO REDUCE POSTSEPTIC GLUCOGENESIS", SURG. FORUM, (1981), vol. 32, pages 96 - 99 [X] 1-11 * page 98, paragraph L * | [X] - A.G.RADCLIFFE ET AL., "Ketone-glucose interaction in fed, fasted, and fasted-infected sheep", AM.J.PHYSIOL., (198305), vol. 244, no. 5, pages R667 - R675 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - R.SWAMINATHAN ET AL., "Blood Concentration and Disappearance of injected Alanine and beta-Hydroxybutyrate in Surgical Patients", HORM.METAB.RES., (198107), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 383 - 386 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - S.LANZA-JACOBY ET AL., "Altered Ketone Body Metabolism During Gram-Negative Sepsis in the Rat", METABOLISM, (199011), vol. 39, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/0026-0495(90)90087-S, pages 1151 - 1157, XP026313713 [A] 1-11 * page 1156, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0026-0495(90)90087-S |