EP0643345 - Data processing device for the monitoring of the operating states of a technical plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/11] | Data processing method and device for the monitoring of the operating states of a technical plant | ||
[1998/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffiths, Antony Hauptstrasse 17 D-91077 Kleinsendelbach / DE | 02 /
Fandrich, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Speckweg 26 D-91096 Möhrendorf / DE | 03 /
Müller, Helmut Dortmunder Strasse 41a D-90425 Nürnberg / DE | [1995/11] | Application number, filing date | 94113223.5 | 24.08.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | DE19934329714 | 02.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4329714 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643345 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643345 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G05B23/0229 (EP,US);
G05B23/0278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsanlage zur Überwachung von Betriebszuständen einer technischen Anlage | [1998/43] | English: | Data processing device for the monitoring of the operating states of a technical plant | [1998/43] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de données pour la surveillance des conditions de fonctionnement d'une installation technique | [1998/43] |
Former [1995/11] | Verfahren und Datenverarbeitungsanlage zur Überwachung von Betriebszuständen einer technischen Anlage | ||
Former [1995/11] | Data processing method and device for the monitoring of the operating states of a technical plant | ||
Former [1995/11] | Procédé et dispositif de traitement de données pour la surveillance des conditions de fonctionnement d'une installation technique | Examination procedure | 04.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02224096 ; | [A]JPS61228501 ; | [A]US5132920 (BELLOWS JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9305477 (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901121), vol. 14, no. 530, Database accession no. (P - 1134), & JP02224096 A 19900906 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870227), vol. 11, no. 66, Database accession no. (P - 552), & JP61228501 A 19861011 (NIPPON ATOM IND GROUP) [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - S. KUMANO ET AL., "development of expert system for operation at substation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIVERY, NEW YORK US, (199301), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/61.180319, pages 56 - 65, XP000331913 [A] 5-14 * page 58, column R, line 33 - line 38 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/61.180319 | Examination | - AT/Automatisierungstechnik, 36 (1988) Nov., No. 11, München, DE, Seiten 421-426, R. Isermann: "Wissensbasierte Fehlerdiagnose technischer Prozesse" |