EP0648934 - Full-circumferential flow pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uwai, Keita, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Yoshiaki, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Makoto, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Masakazu, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Miyake, Yoshio, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Isemoto, Koji, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/45] |
Former [1995/16] | 01 /
Uwai, Keita, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Miyazaki, Yoshiaki, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Kobayashi, Makoto, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Masakazu, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Miyake, Yoshio, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Isomoto, Koji, c/o Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1 Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113241.7 | 24.08.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | JP19930280114 | 13.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28011493 | JP19940054861 | 01.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5486194 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648934 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648934 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04D1/00, F04D13/14, F04D1/06, F04D29/42, F04D13/06, F04D29/22 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
F04D29/4273 (EP);
F04D1/00 (KR);
F04D1/006 (EP);
F04D1/06 (EP);
F04D13/0606 (EP);
F04D13/14 (EP);
F04D29/2211 (EP);
F04D29/2266 (EP);
F04D29/406 (EP);
F04D29/4266 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Seitenströmungspumpe | [1995/16] | English: | Full-circumferential flow pump | [1995/16] | French: | Pompe à écoulement latéral | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 11.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.1998 | BE | 04.11.1998 | CH | 04.11.1998 | GR | 04.11.1998 | LI | 04.11.1998 | NL | 04.11.1998 | SE | 04.11.1998 | DK | 04.02.1999 | PT | 04.02.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
CH | 09.02.1999 | ||
LI | 09.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
BE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 04.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5813196 ; | [A]DE739006 (JOSEF RITZ) [A] 5-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1157493 (EMERJY) [A] 4 * page 3, column L, line 8 - line 16 * * page 3, column R, line 41 - line 46; figure . *; | [DA]DE1653692 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE); | [A]GB2007770 (MATERIEL TELEPHONIQUE) [A] 1,5,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4172695 (UESUGI HISAO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0346731 (GRUNDFOS INT [DK]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0420218 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830413), vol. 7, no. 89, Database accession no. (M - 207)<1234>, & JP58013196 A 19830125 (HITACHI) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - WILLIAM O'KEEFE, "novel pump-impeller concept may solve low-flow recirc problems", POWER, NEW YORK US, (198910), vol. 133, no. 10, pages 29 - 33, XP000094443 [A] 5-11 |