EP0643293 - Pattern defect inspection method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Hiromu, c/o Intellectual Property Division K. K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Kentaro, c/o Intellectual Property Division K. K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113243.3 | 24.08.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | JP19930209453 | 24.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20945393 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643293 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/95607 (EP,US);
G01B11/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Musterfehlern | [1995/11] | English: | Pattern defect inspection method and apparatus | [1995/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection des défauts d'un motif | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2008 | 06.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/40] | 25.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2102122 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, line 49 - line 52 * * page 3, line 28 - line 39 * * page 4, line 7 - line 11 * * page 5, line 4 - line 5 * * page 5, line 13 - line 16; figure 5 *; | [XY]US4532650 (WIHL TIM S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 9, line 4 - line 13 * * column 11, line 21 - line 25 * * column 13, line 19 - line 64 * * column 14, line 41 - line 47 * * figure 8 * [Y] 2,12; | [A]US4958374 (TOKITA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * column A * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 15 ** figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5157735 (MAEDA SHUNJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,12 * column 2, line 30 - line 48 * * column 5, line 62 - line 68 * * column 8, line 25 - line 30 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 4 * * column 9, line 52 - line 63 * * column 10, line 23 - line 26 * * column 10, line 44 - line 52 * * figures 18,19,23 *; | [X]US5185812 (YAMASHITA KYOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * column A * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 35 - line 46 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 47 - line 54 * * column 7, line 1 - line 12 * * column 7, line 41 - line 46 * * column 8, line 45 - line 62 * * column 9, line 13 - line 17; figures 1,9,12 * |