EP0632461 - Memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kersh, David V, III 9901 Sharpcrest Lane, H6 Houston, Texas 77036 / US | 02 /
Childers, Jimmie Don 16707 Quail Briar Missouri City, Texas 77489 / US | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113312.6 | 03.10.1989 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | US19880264404 | 28.10.1988 Original published format: US 264404 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0632461 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0632461 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632461 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/02, G11C8/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/00 (KR);
G11C11/4085 (EP);
G11C5/02 (KR);
G11C5/025 (EP);
G11C8/00 (KR);
G11C8/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/01] | G11C8/00, G11C11/408 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/01] | Title | German: | Speicheranordnung | [1995/01] | English: | Memory device | [1995/01] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89118312.1 / EP0365876 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Request for further processing for: | 21.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2551904 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3447722 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 33, line 15 - page 35, line 7; figure 9 *; | [A]JPS62192086 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880212), vol. 112, no. 46, Database accession no. (P - 665), & JP62192086 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP.) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |