EP0643322 - Flash lockout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiRisio, Anthony, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Marino, John Anthony, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
SanGregory, Jud Anthony, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Baker, Craig A., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113429.8 | 27.08.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930114889 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: US 114889 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643322 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643322 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03B7/16 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G03B7/16 (EP);
G03B15/05 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/11] | Title | German: | Blitzgerätsperre | [1995/11] | English: | Flash lockout | [1995/11] | French: | Blocage de flash | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4214827 (IMURA TOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0326815 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 38 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4908642 (KOMATSUZAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * column 1 - column 5, line 22 * * figures 1,2 * |