EP0646596 - Nucleic acid binding oligomers having C-branches for therapy and diagnosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/21] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löbberding, Dr. Antonius Am Rohm 105 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Mielke, Dr. Burkhard Heisterbachstrasse 4 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Schwemler, Dr. Christoph Am Kloster 59 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
Schwenner, Dr. Eckhard Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 29 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Stropp, Dr. Udo Breidenhofer Strasse 12 D-42781 Haan / DE | 06 /
Springer, Dr. Wolfgang Katernberger Schulweg 31 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
Kretschmer, Dr. Axel Richard-Zörner-Strasse 32 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 08 /
Pötter, Dr. Thorsten Roggendorfstrasse 63 D-51061 Köln / DE | [1995/14] | Application number, filing date | 94113573.3 | 31.08.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | DE19934331011 | 13.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4331011 | [1995/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646596 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646596 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00, A61K38/10 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07C309/66 (EP,US);
C07D239/54 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/14] | Extension states | SI | 31.08.1994 | Title | German: | Nukleinsäure-bindende Oligomere mit C-Verzweigung für Therapie und Diagnostik | [1995/14] | English: | Nucleic acid binding oligomers having C-branches for therapy and diagnosis | [1995/14] | French: | Oligomères liant les acides nucléiques avec branchement en C et leur usage en thérapie et diagnostic | [1998/34] |
Former [1995/14] | Oligomères liant les acides nucléiques avec branchement en C pour thérapie en diagnostic | Examination procedure | 26.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0300796 (SYNTEX INC [US])[A] 1-10 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1-10 |