EP0630112 - Transparent latch circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bland, Patrick M. 4535 Palm Ridge Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US | 02 /
Dean, Mark E. 5054 Beechwood Road Delray Beach, Florida 33484 / US | 03 /
Gaudenzi, Gene J. Oak Ridge Road Purdys, NY 10578 / US | 04 /
Kramer, Kevin G. Lake Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 05 /
Tempest, Susan L. 10 Frederick Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1994/51] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 94113671.5 | 11.04.1989 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | US19880198961 | 26.05.1988 Original published format: US 198961 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0630112 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0630112 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/082, H03K3/356, H03K3/037 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
G06F11/10 (EP,US);
G06F13/40 (KR);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F13/4059 (EP,US);
G06F13/4072 (EP,US);
H03K19/0826 (EP,US);
H03K3/288 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/51] | H03K19/082 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/51] | Title | German: | Transparente Verriegelungsschaltung | [1994/51] | English: | Transparent latch circuit | [1994/51] | French: | Circuit transparente de verrouillage | [1994/51] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/19] | 08.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89480053.1 / EP0344081 | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 29.06.1995 | Date of receipt | 16.11.1995 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   22.07.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1995 | 01.09.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1995 | 01.09.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1995 | 01.09.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1995 | 30.04.1997 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4528465 (HARVEY BARRY [US]) [A] 1-5 * column W *; | [A]EP0154330 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-5* column W * | [A] - J. MILLMAN, Microelectronics: Digital & Analog Circuits and Systems (International Student Edition), SINGAPORE, MCGRAW-HILL, INC. [A] 5 * page 109, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 4.16 * |