EP0644239 - Mixtures of dyes containing fibre-reactive groups and their use of dyeing fibre materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/52] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russ, Werner Hubert, Dr. Wingertstrasse 8a D-65439 Flörsheim/Main / DE | 02 /
Hussong, Kurt, Dr. Gluckstrasse 19 D-65812 Bad Soden/Ts / DE | [1995/12] | Application number, filing date | 94113740.8 | 02.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | DE19934332048 | 21.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332048 | [1995/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644239 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, D06P1/38, // C09B62/44 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C09B62/4403 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/0052 (EP,KR,US);
D06P1/02 (KR);
D06P1/38 (KR);
D06P3/028 (KR);
D06P3/66 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1995/12] | Title | German: | Mischungen von Farbstoffen mit faserreaktiven Gruppen und deren Verwendung zum Färben von Fasermaterialien | [1995/12] | English: | Mixtures of dyes containing fibre-reactive groups and their use of dyeing fibre materials | [1995/12] | French: | Mélanges de colorants avec des groupes réactifs et leur utilisation pour la teinture de matériaux fibreux | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/34] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1333248 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 10 - line 27 *; | [A]WO9013603 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0437184 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9201021 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DY]EP0525805 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0576026 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-14 * abstract * |